NM SB20 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-19 - [LD 26] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-19 - [LD 26] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Dialysis center gross receipts
Title
Dialysis center gross receipts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-19 | [LD 26] Action postponed indefinitely | |
2012-02-19 | [LD 26] Do pass committee report adopted | |
2012-02-18 | [LD 25] Referred to House Taxation & Revenue | |
2012-02-13 | [LD 20] Passed Senate (32-0) | |
2012-02-07 | [LD 16] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted | |
2012-01-20 | [LD 4] Referred to Senate Finance | |
2012-01-20 | [LD 4] Do pass committee report adopted | |
2012-01-18 | [LD 2] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation | |
2012-01-18 | [LD 2] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session | |
2012-01-17 | [LD 1] Referred to Senate Committees' Committee | |
2012-01-17 | [LD 1] Assigned to Senate Committees' Committee and then to Senate Corporations & Transportation and then to Senate Finance | |
2012-01-17 | [LD 1] Senate Pre-file |
New Mexico State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.nmlegis.gov/lcs/legislation.aspx?chamber=S&legtype=B&legno=20&year=12 |
Text | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Sessions/12%20Regular/bills/senate/SB0020.pdf |