NM SB206 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-19 - [LD 26] Passed House (49-21) Signed by one or both houses (Mar. 7) Ch.52.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-19 - [LD 26] Passed House (49-21) Signed by one or both houses (Mar. 7) Ch.52.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Gsd contracts database
Title
Gsd contracts database
Sponsors
Sen. Sander Rue [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-19 | [LD 26] Passed House (49-21) Signed by one or both houses (Mar. 7) Ch.52. | |
2012-02-19 | [LD 26] Do pass committee report adopted | |
2012-02-18 | [LD 25] Referred to House Consumer & Public Affairs | |
2012-02-13 | [LD 20] Passed Senate (37-0) | |
2012-02-07 | [LD 16] Do pass committee report adopted | |
2012-01-27 | [LD 9] Referred to Senate Judiciary | |
2012-01-27 | [LD 9] Do pass committee report adopted | |
2012-01-20 | [LD 4] Referred to Senate Public Affairs | |
2012-01-20 | [LD 4] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session | |
2012-01-18 | [LD 2] Referred to Senate Committees' Committee | |
2012-01-18 | [LD 2] Assigned to Senate Committees' Committee and then to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Judiciary |