NM SB208 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on January 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-28 - [LD 12] Passed House (60-0) Pocket veto by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on January 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-28 - [LD 12] Passed House (60-0) Pocket veto by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
School Advanced Placement Policy
Title
School Advanced Placement Policy
Sponsors
Sen. John Sapien [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-15 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] Passed House (60-0) Pocket veto by the Governor. |
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-26 | House | [LD 10] Referred to House Education |
2017-01-26 | House | [LD 10] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2017-01-25 | House | [LD 9] Referred to House Consumer & Public Affairs |
2017-01-25 | House | [LD 9] Assigned to House Consumer & Public Affairs and then to House Education |
2017-02-03 | Senate | [LD 18] Passed Senate (36-0) |
2017-02-01 | Senate | [LD 16] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-25 | Senate | [LD 9] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2017-01-25 | Senate | [LD 9] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-20 | Senate | [LD 4] Referred to Senate Education |
2017-01-20 | Senate | [LD 4] Assigned to Senate Education and then to Senate Public Affairs |