NM SB240 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Vetoed on January 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-30 - [LD 14] Passed House (64-0) Pocket veto by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on January 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-30 - [LD 14] Passed House (64-0) Pocket veto by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Health Professional Loan Repayment Funding
Title
Health Professional Loan Repayment Funding
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-18 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-30 | House | [LD 14] Passed House (64-0) Pocket veto by the Governor. |
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] Referred to House Appropriations & Finance |
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-26 | House | [LD 10] HHouse Health |
2017-01-26 | House | [LD 10] HHouse Health and then to House Appropriations & Finance |
2017-02-07 | Senate | [LD 22] Passed Senate (39-0) |
2017-02-02 | Senate | [LD 17] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-28 | Senate | [LD 12] Referred to Senate Finance |
2017-01-28 | Senate | [LD 12] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-20 | Senate | [LD 4] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2017-01-20 | Senate | [LD 4] Assigned to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Finance |