NM SB27 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-12 - [LD 8] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-12 - [LD 8] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Car Dealership Changes
Title
Car Dealership Changes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-12 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-12 | Senate | [LD 8] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 28 |
2018-02-12 | House | [LD 8] Passed House (66-0) |
2018-02-09 | House | [LD 6] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-02-09 | House | [LD 6] Referred to House Business & Industry |
2018-02-09 | House | [LD 6] Referred to House Business & Industry |
2018-02-09 | House | [LD 6] Referred to House Judiciary Assigned to Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2018-02-09 | House | [LD 6] Referred to House Business & Industry |
2018-02-09 | House | [LD 6] Assigned to House Business & Industry and then to House Judiciary |
2018-02-06 | Senate | [LD 12] Passed Senate (39-0) |
2018-02-03 | Senate | [LD 11] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-01-30 | Senate | [LD 9] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2018-01-30 | Senate | [LD 9] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-01-30 | Senate | [LD 9] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2018-01-25 | Senate | [LD 7] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2018-01-25 | Senate | [LD 7] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session |
2018-01-16 | Senate | [LD 1] Referred to Senate Committees' Committee |
2018-01-16 | Senate | [LD 1] Assigned to Senate Committees' Committee and then to Senate Corporations & Transportation and then to Senate Judiciary |
2018-01-16 | Senate | [LD 1] Senate Pre-file |