NM SB278 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-18 - [LD 42] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-18 - [LD 42] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Endangered person "brittany alert"
Title
Endangered person "brittany alert"
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-18 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-18 | House | [LD 42] Action postponed indefinitely |
2015-03-18 | House | [LD 42] Referred to House Judiciary |
2015-03-17 | Senate | [LD 41] Passed Senate (38-0) |
2015-03-17 | Senate | [LD 41] Floor amendment adopted |
2015-03-02 | Senate | [LD 30] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-01-30 | Senate | [LD 9] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2015-01-30 | Senate | [LD 9] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-01-22 | Senate | [LD 3] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2015-01-22 | Senate | [LD 3] Assigned to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Judiciary |