NM SB289 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-17 - HEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-17 - HEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Special Ed Division Of Ed Dept.
Title
Special Ed Division Of Ed Dept.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-14 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | House | HEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-03-15 | House | Sent to HEC - Referrals: HEC |
2021-03-14 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:33 N:8 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | SFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2021-03-03 | Senate | SEC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution as amended |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Sent to SEC - Referrals: SEC/SFC |