NM SB302 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 17 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-17 - [LD 41] Passed House (64-1) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 3) Ch. 38.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 17 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-17 - [LD 41] Passed House (64-1) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 3) Ch. 38.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Admin & accounting svc. gross receipts
Title
Admin & accounting svc. gross receipts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-18 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-17 | House | [LD 41] Passed House (64-1) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 3) Ch. 38. |
2015-03-16 | House | [LD 40] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-03-12 | House | [LD 38] HWMC |
2015-03-05 | Senate | [LD 33] Passed Senate (27-11) |
2015-03-05 | Senate | [LD 33] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-01-23 | Senate | [LD 4] Referred to Senate Finance |
2015-01-23 | Senate | [LD 4] WITHOUT RECOMMENDATION committee report adopted |
2015-01-22 | Senate | [LD 3] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2015-01-22 | Senate | [LD 3] Assigned to Senate Corporations & Transportation and then to Senate Finance |