NM SB340 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-05 - [LD 47] HVEC API.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-05 - [LD 47] HVEC API.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
County clerks provide absentee ballot lists
Title
County clerks provide absentee ballot lists
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-05 | [LD 47] HVEC API. | |
2011-03-04 | [LD 46] PASSED/S (22-14) | |
2011-02-21 | [LD 35] DP/a | |
2011-02-11 | [LD 25] DP/a-SPAC | |
2011-01-19 | [LD 2] SRC/SPAC-SRC |
New Mexico State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.nmlegis.gov/lcs/legislation.aspx?chamber=S&legtype=B&legno=340&year=11 |
Text | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Sessions/11%20Regular/bills/senate/SB0340.pdf |