NM SB431 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-09 - SCONC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-09 - SCONC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Public Peace, Health, Safety & Welfare - Youth Conservation Corps Employment
Title
Public Peace, Health, Safety & Welfare
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-09 | Senate | SCONC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-03-04 | Senate | SIRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Referred to: SIRC/SCONC |
2021-03-01 | Senate | SCONC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but without recommendation on Committee Substitution |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Not Printed |
New Mexico State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.nmlegis.gov/lcs/legislation.aspx?chamber=S&legtype=B&legno=431&year=21 |
Text | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Sessions/21%20Regular/bills/senate/SB0431.pdf |