NM SB48 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on February 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-15 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on February 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-15 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Gen Appropriations And Auth Expenditures
Title
Gen Appropriations And Auth Expenditures
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-14 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate has concurred with House Amendments |
2022-02-15 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:67 N:0 |
2022-02-14 | House | HAFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2022-02-11 | House | Sent to HAFC - Referrals: HAFC |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:40 N:0 |
2022-02-08 | Senate | SFC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution |
2022-01-19 | Senate | SCC: Reported by committee to fall within the purview of a 30 day session |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Sent to SCC - Referrals: SCC/SFC |