NM SB536 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 278 - Apr. 5
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 278 - Apr. 5
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriations & Expenditures
Title
Appropriations & Expenditures
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-15 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor - Chapter 278 - Apr. 5 |
2019-03-15 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:54 N:0 |
2019-03-14 | House | HAFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-03-13 | House | Sent to HAFC - Referrals: HAFC |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:39 N:0 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | SFC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Sent to SFC - Referrals: SFC |