NM SB83 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 18 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-18 - [LD 25] Passed House (44-5) Pocket veto by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 18 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-18 - [LD 25] Passed House (44-5) Pocket veto by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
State facility 5 year master plans
Title
State facility 5 year master plans
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-18 | [LD 25] Passed House (44-5) Pocket veto by the Governor. | |
2012-02-17 | [LD 24] Do pass committee report adopted | |
2012-02-08 | [LD 17] Referred to House Taxation & Revenue | |
2012-02-02 | [LD 13] Passed Senate (37-0) | |
2012-01-30 | [LD 10] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action | |
2012-01-20 | [LD 4] Referred to Senate Finance | |
2012-01-20 | [LD 4] Do pass committee report adopted | |
2012-01-18 | [LD 2] Referred to Senate Public Affairs | |
2012-01-18 | [LD 2] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session | |
2012-01-18 | [LD 2] Referred to Senate Committees' Committee | |
2012-01-18 | [LD 2] Assigned to Senate Committees' Committee and then to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Finance |