NM SB85 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 242 - Apr. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 242 - Apr. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Domestic Service In Minimum Wage Act
Title
Domestic Service In Minimum Wage Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-12 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-13 | Senate | Signed by Governor - Chapter 242 - Apr. 4 |
2019-03-13 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:52 N:14 |
2019-03-10 | House | HSEIC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-28 | House | HLVMC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-19 | House | Sent to HLVMC - Referrals: HLVMC/HSEIC |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:25 N:16 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | SCORC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-01-25 | Senate | SPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Sent to SPAC - Referrals: SPAC/SCORC |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Sent to SPREF - Referrals: SPREF |