NM SB91 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-19 - [LD 24] PASSED/H (45-21) SGND (Mar.8) Ch.67.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-19 - [LD 24] PASSED/H (45-21) SGND (Mar.8) Ch.67.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Delay educational retirement contributions
Title
Delay educational retirement contributions
Sponsors
Sen. John Smith [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-19 | [LD 24] PASSED/H (45-21) SGND (Mar.8) Ch.67. | |
2010-02-12 | [LD 19] HEC/HAFC-HEC- DP-HAFC- DP | |
2010-02-08 | [LD 15] DP - PASSED/S (35-3) | |
2010-01-25 | [LD 5] DP-SFC | |
2010-01-20 | [LD 2] germane-SEC | |
2010-01-19 | [LD 1] SCC/SEC/SFC-SCC |