NM SB96 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-19 - [LD 26] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-19 - [LD 26] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Limit school retentions through interventions
Title
Limit school retentions through interventions
Sponsors
Sen. John Smith [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-19 | [LD 26] Action postponed indefinitely | |
2012-02-19 | [LD 26] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted | |
2012-02-17 | [LD 24] Referred to House Judiciary | |
2012-02-17 | [LD 24] Do pass committee report adopted | |
2012-02-17 | [LD 24] Referred to House Education | |
2012-02-17 | [LD 24] Assigned to House Education and then to House Judiciary | |
2012-02-07 | [LD 16] Passed Senate (24-15) | |
2012-02-07 | [LD 16] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted | |
2012-02-02 | [LD 13] Referred to Senate Finance | |
2012-02-02 | [LD 13] WITHOUT RECOMMENDATION committee report adopted and then to a | |
2012-01-27 | [LD 9] Referred to Senate Education | |
2012-01-27 | [LD 9] WITHOUT RECOMMENDATION committee report adopted | |
2012-01-20 | [LD 4] Referred to Senate Public Affairs | |
2012-01-20 | [LD 4] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session | |
2012-01-18 | [LD 2] Referred to Senate Committees' Committee | |
2012-01-18 | [LD 2] Assigned to Senate Committees' Committee and then to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Education and then to Senate Finance |
New Mexico State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.nmlegis.gov/lcs/legislation.aspx?chamber=S&legtype=B&legno=96&year=12 |
Text | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Sessions/12%20Regular/bills/senate/SB0096.pdf |