NM SJM12 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-12 - [LD 19] PASSED/H (60-1) SGND.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-12 - [LD 19] PASSED/H (60-1) SGND.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Study various school calendars
Title
Study various school calendars
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-12 | [LD 19] PASSED/H (60-1) SGND. | |
2010-02-11 | [LD 18] DP | |
2010-02-05 | [LD 14] HEC | |
2010-02-01 | [LD 10] PASSED/S (33-0) | |
2010-01-29 | [LD 9] DP | |
2010-01-27 | [LD 7] DP-SEC | |
2010-01-19 | [LD 1] SRC/SEC-SRC |