NM SJM7 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-14 - [LD 9] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-14 - [LD 9] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
"public Lands Day"
Title
"public Lands Day"
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-14 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-14 | Senate | [LD 9] Signed by one or both houses |
2018-02-14 | House | [LD 9] Passed House (59-0) |
2018-02-14 | House | [LD 9] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2018-02-05 | House | [LD 5] Tabled temporarily by motion and then to H |
2018-02-02 | Senate | [LD 11] Passed Senate (29-0) |
2018-02-02 | Senate | [LD 10] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2018-01-22 | Senate | [LD 3] Tabled temporarily by motion and then to S |
2018-01-16 | Senate | [LD 1] Senate Pre-file |