NM SM20 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-04 - [LD 46] PASSED/S (40-0) SGND.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-04 - [LD 46] PASSED/S (40-0) SGND.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Alternate uses for state fairground property
Title
Alternate uses for state fairground property
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-04 | [LD 46] PASSED/S (40-0) SGND. | |
2011-03-02 | [LD 44] DP | |
2011-02-21 | [LD 35] DP-SPAC | |
2011-01-22 | [LD 5] SRC/SPAC-SRC |