NV AB140 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to child welfare; prohibiting discrimination against persons who are deaf, legally blind or otherwise physically disabled in certain proceedings relating to children; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits discrimination against persons with a physical disability in certain proceedings relating to children. (BDR 11-172)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2019-05-20SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2019-05-20SenateRead third time.
2019-05-16SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2019-05-15SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2019-05-14SenateRead second time.
2019-05-13SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2019-04-24SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2019-04-24SenateIn Senate.
2019-04-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
2019-04-23AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2019-04-22AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. Nos. 300 and 595.) To printer.
2019-04-22AssemblyPlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-04-22AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-02-15AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2019-02-14AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback