NV AB147 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 26.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 26.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to providers of health care; authorizing a physician assistant or advanced practice registered nurse to perform certain services; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Authorizes a physician assistant or advanced practice registered nurse to perform certain services. (BDR 40-85)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-03 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-14 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 26. |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | Senate Amendment No. 649 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 649.) To printer. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 1, Vacant: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-03-13 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2019-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer. |