NV AB376 | 2011 | 76th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 505.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 505.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Makes various changes regarding local governmental administration. (BDR 21-148)
Title
Makes various changes regarding local governmental administration. (BDR 21-148)
Sponsors
Rep. David Bobzien [D] | Rep. Marcus Conklin [D] | Rep. Joseph Hogan [D] | Rep. Marilyn Kirkpatrick [D] |
Sen. Sheila Leslie [D] | Rep. John Oceguera [D] | Sen. Debbie Smith [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-26 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 505. | |
2011-06-16 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2011-06-09 | To enrollment. | |
2011-06-08 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint . | |
2011-06-06 | To printer. | |
2011-06-06 | Conference report adopted by Senate. | |
2011-06-06 | Conference report adopted by Assembly. | |
2011-06-06 | From committee: Concur in Senate Amendment No. 632 and further amend. | |
2011-06-05 | Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To committee. | |
2011-06-04 | In Assembly. | |
2011-06-04 | Senate Amendment No. 632 not receded from. Conference requested. Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To Assembly. | |
2011-06-03 | In Senate. | |
2011-06-03 | Senate Amendment No. 632 not concurred in. To Senate. | |
2011-05-31 | In Assembly. | |
2011-05-30 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2011-05-29 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2011-05-29 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint . | |
2011-05-28 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 632.) To printer. | |
2011-05-28 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2011-05-28 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2011-04-27 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. | |
2011-04-27 | In Senate. | |
2011-04-26 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. | |
2011-04-26 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . | |
2011-04-25 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 395.) To printer. | |
2011-04-25 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2011-04-25 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2011-03-23 | From printer. To committee. | |
2011-03-21 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |