NV AB391 | 2015 | 78th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-25 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 184.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-25 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 184.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions governing the exemption from property taxes of certain property used for religious worship. (BDR 32-825)
Title
Revises provisions governing the exemption from property taxes of certain property used for religious worship. (BDR 32-825)
Sponsors
Rep. Patrick Hickey [R] | Rep. Jill Dickman [R] | Rep. Amber Joiner [D] | Rep. Randy Kirner [R] |
Rep. Michael Sprinkle [D] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-25 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 184. |
2015-05-19 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2015-05-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2015-05-17 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2015-05-16 | Senate | Read second time. |
2015-05-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Revenue and Economic Development. To committee. |
2015-04-17 | Senate | In Senate. |
2015-04-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Senate. |
2015-04-15 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2015-04-14 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2015-04-10 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2015-04-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2015-03-20 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2015-03-17 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer. |