NV AB422 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 540.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 540.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to the use of marijuana. (BDR 40-983)
Title
Revises provisions relating to the use of marijuana. (BDR 40-983)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 16 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-12 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 540. |
2017-06-08 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | Senate Amendment Nos. 1115 and 1151 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Fourth reprint . To Assembly. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | To printer. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 16, Nays: 4, Excused: 1.) |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Reprinting dispensed with. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1151.) |
2017-06-05 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint . |
2017-06-04 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1115.) To printer. |
2017-06-04 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2017-06-04 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. |
2017-06-02 | Senate | In Senate. |
2017-06-02 | Assembly | To Senate. |
2017-06-02 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint . |
2017-06-02 | Assembly | To printer. |
2017-06-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 36, Nays: 5, Not voting: 1.) |
2017-06-02 | Assembly | Dispensed with reprinting. |
2017-06-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1073.) |
2017-06-02 | Assembly | Placed on General File. |
2017-06-02 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee. |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 274.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer. |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2017-04-10 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2017-03-28 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2017-03-27 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer. |