NV AB482 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 381.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 381.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to businesses; requiring the Secretary of State to suspend the state business license of a person who owes a debt to a state agency under certain circumstances; requiring the Secretary of State to reinstate the suspended license under certain circumstances; revising provisions governing notifications of certain debts collected by the State Controller; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to state business licenses. (BDR 7-1144)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-29 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-04 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 381. |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-05-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 17, Nays: 4.) To Assembly. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Read second time. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | In Senate. |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | To Senate. |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 26, Nays: 16.) To printer. |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | Dispensed with reprinting. |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 769.) |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer. |