NV AJR2A | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR2
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - (No further action taken.)
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - (No further action taken.)
Summary
Proposing to amend the Nevada Constitution to revise provisions governing the rate of the tax upon the net proceeds of minerals extracted in this State.
Title
Proposes to amend the Nevada Constitution to revise provisions governing the rate of the tax upon the net proceeds of minerals extracted in this State. (BDR C-29)
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Assembly | (No further action taken.) |
2021-04-09 | Assembly | Waiver granted effective: April 8, 2021. |
2021-02-04 | Assembly | To committee. |
2021-02-01 | Assembly | From printer. |
2021-02-01 | Assembly | Resolution read. Referred to Committee on Revenue. To printer. |
2021-02-01 | Assembly | Returned from Secretary of State. |
Same As/Similar To
AJR2 (Carry Over) 2019-06-01 - File No. 35.
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/App/NELIS/REL/81st2021/Bill/7339/Overview |