NV SB108 | 2011 | 76th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-16 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-16 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases the fees for issuing certain numbers and validation decals for motorboats. (BDR 43-765)
Title
Increases the fees for issuing certain numbers and validation decals for motorboats. (BDR 43-765)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-16 | (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.) | |
2011-02-07 | Read first time. To committee. | |
2011-02-02 | From printer. | |
2011-02-01 | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/76th2011/Reports/history.cfm?ID=251 |
Text | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/76th2011/Bills/SB/SB108.pdf |