NV SB114 | 2011 | 76th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-24 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 102.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-24 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 102.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to controlled substances. (BDR 40-190)
Title
Revises provisions relating to controlled substances. (BDR 40-190)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-07 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-24 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 102. | |
2011-05-20 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2011-05-19 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |
2011-05-18 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. | |
2011-05-17 | Read second time. | |
2011-05-17 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2011-05-17 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2011-04-08 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee. | |
2011-04-08 | In Assembly. | |
2011-04-07 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2011-04-07 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . | |
2011-04-06 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 83.) To printer. | |
2011-04-04 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2011-02-07 | Read first time. To committee. | |
2011-02-04 | From printer. | |
2011-02-03 | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer. |