NV SB166 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - Chapter 593.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - Chapter 593.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to employment; requiring certain penalties and fines imposed by the Nevada Equal Rights Commission for certain unlawful discriminatory practices to be deposited in the State General Fund; revising provisions governing the filing of complaints of employment discrimination with the Nevada Equal Rights Commission; revising provisions relating to unlawful employment practices; revising the relief that the Commission may order if it determines that an unlawful employment practice has occurred; revising provisions relating to the time in which a person may seek relief in district court for a claim of unlawful employment practices; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to employment. (BDR 18-5)
Sponsors
Sen. Patricia Spearman [D] | Sen. Nicole Cannizzaro [D] | Sen. James Ohrenschall [D] | Sen. David Parks [D] |
Sen. Yvanna Cancela [D] | Sen. Moises Denis [D] | Sen. Joyce Woodhouse [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-13 | Senate | Chapter 593. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Assembly Amendment No. 860 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2019-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 38, Nays: 3, Vacant: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-06-01 | Assembly | Placed on General File. |
2019-06-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass, as amended. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | To committee. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 860.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: 1.) To Assembly. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 444.) To printer. |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-04-19 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |