NV SB191 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to education; requiring each public school in a school district, including a charter school, to establish and maintain a school library that meets certain standards; requiring the State Board of Education to adopt regulations prescribing the minimum standards for a school library; prescribing requirements and exceptions for employing a teacher librarian; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires each public school in a school district to establish and maintain a school library. (BDR 34-562)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-04Senate(No further action taken.)
2019-04-17SenateExemption effective.
2019-04-17SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee.
2019-04-16SenateRe-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.
2019-04-16SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 289.)
2019-04-16SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-04-16SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-03-18SenateNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2019-02-19SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2019-02-18SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback