NV SB2 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-18 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to the criminal justice system; creating the Subcommittee on Specialty Courts of the Advisory Commission on the Administration of Justice; revising the membership and quorum requirements of the Advisory Commission; revising certain provisions related to the Subcommittee on Victims of Crime of the Advisory Commission; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to the Advisory Commission on the Administration of Justice. (BDR 14-407)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-18Assembly(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
2019-04-17AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2019-04-17AssemblyIn Assembly.
2019-04-16SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2019-04-16SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2019-04-15SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 76.) To printer.
2019-04-15SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-04-15SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-02-04SenateRead first time. To committee.
2018-11-15SenateFrom printer.
2018-11-14SenatePrefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback