NV SB221 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 35, Nays: 4, Excused: 2, Vacant: 1.) To Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to trespassing; revising provisions governing warnings against trespassing; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions governing warnings against trespassing. (BDR 15-17)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-24AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 35, Nays: 4, Excused: 2, Vacant: 1.) To Senate.
2019-05-24AssemblyPlaced on General File.
2019-05-24AssemblyTaken from Chief Clerk's desk.
2019-05-23AssemblyPlaced on Chief Clerk's desk.
2019-05-23AssemblyTaken from General File.
2019-05-23AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2019-05-22AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 781.) To printer.
2019-05-22AssemblyPlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-05-22AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-03-20AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2019-03-20AssemblyIn Assembly.
2019-03-19SenateRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2019-03-18SenateRead second time.
2019-03-15SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2019-02-19SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2019-02-18SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback