NV SB24 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 393.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 393.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to workforce development; revising requirements governing the approval of a program of workforce development by the Office of Economic Development; revising provisions governing the distribution and use of money provided by the Office to defray the cost of certain programs of workforce development; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to workforce development. (BDR 18-289)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-04 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 393. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Assembly Amendment No. 852 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2021-05-31 | Senate | In Senate. |
2021-05-31 | Assembly | To Senate. |
2021-05-31 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint. |
2021-05-31 | Assembly | To printer. |
2021-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 38, Nays: 4.) |
2021-05-31 | Assembly | Dispensed with reprinting. |
2021-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 852.) |
2021-05-31 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2021-05-31 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-05-18 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee. |
2021-05-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. To Assembly. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To printer. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Reprinting dispensed with. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 546.) |
2021-05-14 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Exemption effective. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Taken from General File. Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 110.) |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Read first time. To committee. |
2020-12-14 | Senate | From printer. |
2020-11-18 | Senate | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Revenue and Economic Development. To printer. |