NV SB266 | 2011 | 76th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-21 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-21 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions governing the possession of pets by tenants of a manufactured home park. (BDR 10-960)
Title
Revises provisions governing the possession of pets by tenants of a manufactured home park. (BDR 10-960)
Sponsors
Sen. Shirley Breeden [D] | Rep. Richard Carrillo [D] | Rep. Joseph Hogan [D] | Sen. James Ohrenschall [D] |
Sen. David Parks [D] | Sen. Dean Rhoads [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-25 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-21 | (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.) | |
2011-04-26 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee. | |
2011-04-25 | In Assembly. | |
2011-04-25 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2011-04-25 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . | |
2011-04-22 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 303.) To printer. | |
2011-04-20 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2011-03-21 | From printer. To committee. | |
2011-03-18 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer. |