NV SB276 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-11 - Chapter 527.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-11 - Chapter 527.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to real estate; imposing a technology fee for the issuance or renewal of certain licenses, certificates, permits and registrations issued by the Real Estate Division of the Department of Business and Industry; prescribing requirements governing the use of money collected from the fee; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Imposes a technology fee for the issuance or renewal of certain licenses, certificates, permits and registrations issued by the Real Estate Division of the Department of Business and Industry. (BDR 54-840)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-11 | Senate | Chapter 527. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-05-31 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2021-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 33, Nays: 9.) To Senate. |
2021-05-31 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2021-05-31 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Placed on General File. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Exemption effective. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Taken from General File. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Read second time. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer. |