NV SB38 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-13 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-13 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to professions; providing for the certification of certified electronic recorders and certified electronic transcribers; providing for the licensure of court recording and transcribing firms; prohibiting a person from engaging in the practice of court recording or the practice of court transcribing without a certificate issued by the Certified Court Reporters' Board of Nevada; prohibiting a business entity from conducting business as a court recording and transcribing firm without a license issued by the Board; revising certain provisions governing court reporters and court reporting firms; expanding existing fee schedules; providing a penalty; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Makes various changes relating to the practice of court reporting, the practice of court recording and the practice of court transcribing. (BDR 54-235)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-13 | Senate | (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | From committee: Re-refer to Committee on Judiciary. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Read first time. To committee. |
2018-11-21 | Senate | From printer. |
2018-11-19 | Senate | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/App/NELIS/REL/80th2019/Bill/5957/Overview |
Text | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/80th2019/Bills/SB/SB38.pdf |