NV SB4 | 2020 | 31st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-17 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 1.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-17 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 1.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to state securities; authorizing the State Board of Finance to issue interim debentures for a temporary period to fund the general operations of the State under certain circumstances; temporarily revising provisions governing payments made from the Consolidated Bond Interest and Redemption Fund; temporarily revising provisions governing the fixing of interest rates for certain state securities; temporarily revising provisions governing the issuance of interim debentures; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Temporarily revises provisions governing public borrowing. (BDR 30-19)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-14 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-14 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-14 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-17 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 1. |
2020-07-17 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2020-07-15 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2020-07-14 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. |
2020-07-14 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2020-07-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2020-07-14 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee of the Whole. To committee. |
2020-07-14 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2020-07-14 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To Assembly. |
2020-07-14 | Senate | To printer. |
2020-07-14 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) |
2020-07-14 | Senate | Reprinting dispensed with. |
2020-07-14 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 3.) |
2020-07-14 | Senate | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2020-07-14 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2020-07-10 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2020-07-09 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee of the Whole. To printer. |