NV SB429 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 470.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 470.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT making a supplemental appropriation to the Office of the Attorney General for a projected shortfall related to extradition costs; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Makes a supplemental appropriation to the Office of the Attorney General for a projected shortfall related to extradition costs. (BDR S-1146)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-27 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-04 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 470. |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2021-05-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 37, Nays: 4, Excused: 1.) To Senate. |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-05-18 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee. |
2021-05-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Read second time. |
2021-05-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-04-30 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer. |