NV SB456 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-11 - Chapter 535.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-11 - Chapter 535.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public health; transferring the State Dental Health Officer from the Division of Public and Behavioral Health of the Department of Health and Human Services to the Division of Health Care Financing and Policy of the Department; revising provisions governing the supervision of persons who hold a restricted license to practice dentistry at certain facilities; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to the State Dental Health Officer. (BDR 40-1159)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-11 | Senate | Chapter 535. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-05-31 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2021-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. |
2021-05-29 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-28 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-28 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2021-05-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee. |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Read second time. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer. |