NV SB463 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Chapter 621.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Chapter 621.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to coroners; authorizing a coroner to test a decedent for communicable diseases without a court order under certain circumstances; authorizing a coroner to establish certain programs; authorizing a coroner to subpoena certain documents, records and materials; providing that funds from the account for the support of the office of the county coroner can be used to pay expenses relating to certain programs; requiring a postmortem examination be performed by a forensic pathologist under certain circumstances; increasing certain fees for the support of the office of the county coroner; making various other changes relating to coroners; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions related to county officers. (BDR 20-1153)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-17 | Senate | Chapter 621. |
2019-06-14 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | To enrollment. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | To printer. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | (Conference Amend. No. CA1.) |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Conference report adopted by Assembly. |
2019-06-02 | Senate | Conference report adopted by Senate. |
2019-06-02 | Senate | From committee: Concur in Assembly Amendment No. 765 and further amend. |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To committee. |
2019-05-31 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-05-31 | Assembly | Assembly Amendment No. 765 not receded from. Conference requested. Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To Senate. |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Assembly Amendment No. 765 not concurred in. To Assembly. |
2019-05-27 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 34, Nays: 5, Excused: 2, Vacant: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 765.) To printer. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-04-19 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. |
2019-04-19 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 258.) To printer. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |