NV SB49 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 486.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 486.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to cannabis; prohibiting synthetic cannabinoids from being produced, sold or offered for sale in this State; authorizing the Cannabis Compliance Board to employ the services of persons the Board considers necessary for the purposes of hearing disciplinary proceedings; authorizing
Title
Revises provisions relating to cannabis. (BDR 56-268)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-04 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 486. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Assembly Amendment No. 535 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. |
2021-05-21 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Absent: 1.) To Senate. |
2021-05-21 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 535.) To printer. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-04-14 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. |
2021-04-14 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Not voting: 1.) To Assembly. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 49.) To printer. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Read first time. To committee. |
2020-12-15 | Senate | From printer. |
2020-11-18 | Senate | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer. |