NV SB66 | 2011 | 76th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-30 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 161.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-30 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 161.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to multidisciplinary teams to review the deaths of victims of crimes that constitute domestic violence. (BDR 18-268)
Title
Revises provisions relating to multidisciplinary teams to review the deaths of victims of crimes that constitute domestic violence. (BDR 18-268)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-22 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-30 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 161. | |
2011-05-27 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2011-05-25 | To enrollment. | |
2011-05-25 | In Senate. | |
2011-05-23 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: 2.) To Senate. | |
2011-05-20 | Read second time. | |
2011-05-20 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2011-05-20 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2011-04-25 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. | |
2011-04-25 | In Assembly. | |
2011-04-22 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2011-04-21 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . | |
2011-04-20 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 119.) To printer. | |
2011-04-19 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2011-02-07 | Read first time. To committee. | |
2010-12-17 | From printer. | |
2010-12-15 | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |