NV SB90 | 2015 | 78th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-06 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 6.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-06 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 6.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Confers upon a person who is subject to the Nevada Code of Military Justice the right to demand a court-martial in lieu of accepting nonjudicial punishment. (BDR 36-338)
Title
Confers upon a person who is subject to the Nevada Code of Military Justice the right to demand a court-martial in lieu of accepting nonjudicial punishment. (BDR 36-338)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-06 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 6. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2015-03-04 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2015-03-03 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. |
2015-03-02 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2015-02-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2015-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. |
2015-02-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 19, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Assembly. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Read second time. |
2015-02-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Read first time. To committee. |
2014-12-22 | Senate | From printer. |
2014-12-20 | Senate | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |