NY A00028 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - reported referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - reported referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires restaurants that offer online delivery services via the internet or mobile application to post the web address to view recent sanitary inspection grades on their website.
Title
Requires restaurants that offer online delivery services via the internet or mobile application to post the web address to view recent sanitary inspection grades on their website.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-03 - Assembly - Assembly Cities Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Cities Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Cities Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2024-03-29 | Assembly | print number 28b |
2024-03-29 | Assembly | amend and recommit to cities |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to cities |
2023-05-16 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-05-11 | Assembly | print number 28a |
2023-05-11 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to cities |
2023-01-04 | Assembly | referred to cities |
Same As/Similar To
S00509 (Same As) 2024-02-26 - AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 509A