NY A00090 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-12)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-02 - print number 90b
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-02 - print number 90b
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts "Erin Merryn's law"; requires the commissioner of education to make recommendations to the board of regents relating to instruction on preventing child sexual exploitation and child abuse in grades kindergarten through eight.
Title
Enacts "Erin Merryn's law"; requires the commissioner of education to make recommendations to the board of regents relating to instruction on preventing child sexual exploitation and child abuse in grades kindergarten through eight.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-02 | Assembly | print number 90b |
2016-02-02 | Assembly | amend and recommit to education |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to education |
2015-05-15 | Assembly | print number 90a |
2015-05-15 | Assembly | amend and recommit to education |
2015-01-07 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S01947 (Same As) 2016-03-07 - referred to education