NY A00164 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-16 - advanced to third reading cal.400
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-16 - advanced to third reading cal.400
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to a stay of issuance of a warrant for eviction for certain holdover tenants.
Title
Relates to a stay of issuance of a warrant for eviction for certain holdover tenants.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-16 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.400 |
2012-03-12 | Assembly | reported |
2012-03-06 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to housing |
2011-05-12 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.289 |
2011-05-10 | Assembly | reported |
2011-04-12 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2011-01-05 | Assembly | referred to housing |
Same As/Similar To
S04079 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - COMMITTED TO RULES