NY A00171 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires owners of multiple dwelling properties to develop, implement and distribute smoking policies to current and prospective tenants; requires a posted copy of the smoking policy; requires such policy be incorporated into all written and oral leases and contracts for sale; allows the enforcement officer the power to impose a civil penalty for violations.
Title
Requires owners of multiple dwelling properties to develop, implement and distribute smoking policies to current and prospective tenants; requires a posted copy of the smoking policy; requires such policy be incorporated into all written and oral leases and contracts for sale; allows the enforcement officer the power to impose a civil penalty for violations.
Sponsors
Asm. Amy Paulin [D] | Asm. Jeffrey Dinowitz [D] | Asm. David Weprin [D] | Asm. Chantel Jackson [D] |
Asm. Gina Sillitti [D] | Asm. Rodneyse Bichotte Hermelyn [D] | Asm. Karl Brabenec [R] | Asm. Didi Barrett [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-17 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-17 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.12 |
2023-04-20 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.120 |
2023-04-17 | Assembly | reported |
2023-01-17 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2023-01-04 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S04582 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO HEALTH