NY A00197 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that excise taxes imposed on motor fuel pursuant to certain provisions of the tax law shall not be imposed during prescribed periods for Friday, May 24th, 2019 through Monday, May 27th, 2019, Thursday, July 4th, 2019 through Monday, July 8th, 2019 and Friday, August 30th, 2019 through Monday, September 2nd, 2019; requires retail dealers of motor fuel and diesel motor fuel to reduce prices for such fuel.
Title
Provides that excise taxes imposed on motor fuel pursuant to certain provisions of the tax law shall not be imposed during prescribed periods for Friday, May 24th, 2019 through Monday, May 27th, 2019, Thursday, July 4th, 2019 through Monday, July 8th, 2019 and Friday, August 30th, 2019 through Monday, September 2nd, 2019; requires retail dealers of motor fuel and diesel motor fuel to reduce prices for such fuel.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-01-09 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |