NY A00218 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-28 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
Pending: Senate Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-28 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
Pending: Senate Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits debt collectors from collecting or attempting to collect a debt owed by a deceased debtor that is known by such debt collector to be deceased.
Title
Prohibits debt collectors from collecting or attempting to collect a debt owed by a deceased debtor that is known by such debt collector to be deceased.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 94 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-04-03 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.526 |
2014-04-01 | Assembly | reported |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | print number 218a |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2014-02-04 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
2013-01-29 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2013-01-09 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |