NY A00306 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-01 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-01 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a personal income tax check-off box for donations to the school-based health centers fund; creates the school-based health centers fund; specifies the use for which moneys of the fund may be expended.
Title
Creates a personal income tax check-off box for donations to the school-based health centers fund; creates the school-based health centers fund; specifies the use for which moneys of the fund may be expended.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 126 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2012-03-01 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2012-03-01 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-02-13 | Assembly | amended on third reading 306a |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.18 |
2012-01-04 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-01-04 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2011-06-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2011-06-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2011-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.512 |
2011-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.512 |
2011-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2011-06-20 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2011-01-05 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S00326 (Same As) 2012-03-12 - COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES